Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Norman Lewis, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Crotty, John Michael, against Nichols Law Firm, Pllc, represented by Nichols, Joseph P., Nichols, Kevin Frederic, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Glen Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlen Bruening Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Conversion/Judiciary Law) |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 22, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 12, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 09, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 17, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 27, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: May 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 27, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 17, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 02, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 28, 2023STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 27, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: March 29, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 02, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
May 02, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 29, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Correspondence Dated 3/29/2023 - Issue w/ Captions of Filed Documents |
||
March 28, 2023 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order |
||
March 27, 2023 | Affidavit of Service | ||
March 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 27, 2023 |
STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order |
||
March 27, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 22, 2023 |
ANSWER Plaintiffs Answer to Counterclaim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.