Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicinig, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fox, Christine L., Goldberg, Brian David, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, Polowy, Amy E., against Capital One Bank Usa, Na, John Doe, Jonathan H. Hamborsky, Rebecca J Buchanan, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllison M. Mcgahay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: May 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 27, 2022NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 03, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 01, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 22, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 02, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: May 22, 2023NOTICE
Date: May 30, 2023NOTICE
Date: May 03, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 |
NOTICE Rescheduling Notice |
||
May 22, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 22, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
May 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
May 03, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 03, 2023 |
NOTICE Judicial Assignment Notice |
||
May 02, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
May 02, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
April 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE/ JOHN DOE |
||
March 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.