Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Neighbors Of Abenaki, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Meyer, Justin Robert, against Robert Miller, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Article 7-B) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is filed by Neighbors of Abenaki, LLC against Robert Miller and any occupants and licensees of the premises located at 20 Aspen Court, Plattsburgh, New York. Neighbors of Abenaki, LLC is the owner of the mobile home lot at the mentione...
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 12, 2024ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 13, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 26, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 15, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: December 01, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: December 13, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: November 29, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: November 29, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 29, 2023PETITION
Date: November 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 15, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 12, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 13, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
December 13, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 01, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 01, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
November 29, 2023 | NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
November 29, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
November 29, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Photos of Premises |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.