Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Johnson, Heather Ann, against Justin Wemple, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllison M. Mcgahay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 23, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 21, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 21, 2023JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: October 04, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1) Affirmation of Non-military Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 21, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: July 24, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 21, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 21, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Affidavit of Plaintiff and Supporting Documents
Date: July 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
October 04, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 26, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Defendant's affidavit on opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment |
||
July 27, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
July 25, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mail Service |
||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment mailed to the Court 7/25/2023 |
||
July 25, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Amended Notice of Motion |
||
July 24, 2023 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.