Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against James D Hart, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION
Date: April 03, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: April 04, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: April 03, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 03, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 19, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 03, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
April 03, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
April 03, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
April 03, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
April 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT AOF |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
January 23, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
January 11, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.