Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against John P Weightman, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DLRW705689 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 TERMS AND CONDITIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 20, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: July 21, 2023AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 03, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 20, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 TERMS AND CONDITIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR TERMS AND CONDITIONS Redacted |
||
July 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATION Redacted |
||
July 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
July 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
July 20, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
July 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
July 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
February 09, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
February 03, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.