Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Jakas, Joseph Karl, Powell, Larry T, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Sonya Dubrey, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 02, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Auth |
||
November 02, 2021 | Affidavit of Military Investigation | ||
November 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION 3215G |
||
November 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
November 02, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
November 02, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) judgment |
||
November 02, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice |
||
October 18, 2021 |
NOTICE ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
||
September 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SONYA DUBREY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.