Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Debbie L Passino, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Anderson, Mark Elton, against David M Passino Sr., represented by Bukolt-Ryder, Maryanne, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Timothy J. Lawliss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Sealed |
||
April 06, 2022 |
SEPARATION AGREEMENT - MODIFIED Sealed |
||
April 05, 2022 |
SEPARATION AGREEMENT Sealed |
||
March 24, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Sealed |
||
March 23, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT Sealed |
||
March 21, 2022 |
DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION Sealed |
||
March 18, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Sealed |
||
March 16, 2022 |
PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION Sealed |
||
March 14, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Sealed |
||
January 19, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.