Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Cortney F Drown, represented by Asani, Zarije, Resnick, Joshua Colin, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Kathleen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: June 01, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 03, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING
Date: February 11, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 22, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 03, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 22, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 03, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 24, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 30, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 22, 2022ANSWER
Date: May 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 30, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1390730 |
||
June 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1390730 |
||
June 30, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1390730 |
||
May 31, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 31, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 24, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order |
||
March 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Court Order |
||
March 30, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) | ||
March 24, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.