Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Captial One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stebbins, Donald Rogers, against Mukerji, Sasanka, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions60 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Capital One Bank vs. Mukerji, S. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction 234110-Satisfaction Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SATISFACTION [234110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued 227110-Abstract: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ABSTRACT: ISSUED [227110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration 213310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DECLARATION [213310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default 226130-Judgment: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT: DEFAULT [226130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Feb 13 2007 Type: 244210 - Judgment: Clerk Default Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) 212320-Proof of Service: Summons (DLR) Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE: SUMMONS (DLR) [212320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.