Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jamie Burdo, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Spada, Derek J, against Johnson & Lund Co Inc, Royal Dental Manufacturing, Inc., represented by Lawyer, Robert Roy, Manson, David B, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Kathleen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen B. Hogan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Fall Down) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 07, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 03, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: May 28, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 18, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 27, 2021SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: June 16, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 17, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 29, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 21, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: June 09, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: July 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 05, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 05, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 25, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Letter Order |
||
May 25, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 04, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 04, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 05, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 05, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
July 27, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
July 22, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge |
||
July 21, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service- Johnson Lund |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.