Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Andrew Kaplan, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: April 28, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: February 25, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: April 28, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 28, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 06, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: January 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 28, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
April 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
April 28, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
April 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
April 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
April 28, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
February 25, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
February 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 17, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.