Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, A Subsidiary Of First National Of Nebraska, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against David Hartigan, represented by Ruggiero, Daniel Goldsmith, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: November 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2020ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 30, 2020ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: January 26, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*
Date: November 23, 2020ANSWER
Date: December 08, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 04, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
December 30, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 08, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 08, 2020 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
December 08, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
November 23, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-DAVID HARTIGAN -46301988 |
||
November 23, 2020 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected* AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
November 04, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
November 04, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT REFLECTING BALANCE |
||
November 04, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.