Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Langlois, Christopher P, against Valerie Mitchem, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 29, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: March 15, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: March 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: December 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Statues of Limitations |
||
March 15, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Facts of Purchase |
||
March 15, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Facts of Sale |
||
March 15, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Military |
||
March 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 15, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT 2nd mailing |
||
December 24, 2020 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
November 23, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 29, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.