Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Jerry Nason, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 20, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 22, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 22, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: September 23, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: November 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 22, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#329965 |
||
November 20, 2020 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
November 16, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 20, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
October 20, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.