Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Community Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Anthony Giambruno, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts Clinton County Supreme Court with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions188 days |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseClinton County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time188 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 16, 2020ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: May 29, 2020RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)
Date: May 19, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: May 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1)
Date: May 19, 2020EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: May 19, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 14, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 11, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) | |
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1) | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.