Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Allan J Nephew, Sandra J Nephew, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllison M. Mcgahay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Consumer Credit) |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: February 15, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: February 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 24, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: May 24, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 24, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 24, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 24, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 24, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: May 24, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: August 23, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 22, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 21, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 22, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 22, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 21, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 23, 2023 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
August 23, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 22, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 22, 2023 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney - Allan Nephew |
||
June 22, 2023 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney - Sandra Nephew |
||
May 24, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) attorney affirmation in support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.