Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nbt Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Levine, Louis, against Joseph Burkhardt, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 06, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk 8/22/2023 |
||
August 21, 2023 | affidavit of facts | ||
August 21, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A military search |
||
August 21, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT non military |
||
August 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT SLE |
||
July 21, 2023 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) Mailed on 7/21/23 |
||
July 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A contract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.