Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Anthony B Crothers, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Eisenhut, Clifford Craig, against Deborah W Crothers, represented by Egitton, Amy B., in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
November 01, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 01, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
September 26, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 23, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 23, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 23, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
September 23, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
September 14, 2022 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
September 08, 2022 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.