Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Jeffrey Downey, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: April 29, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 29, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Buyer |
||
April 29, 2022 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) mailed 4/29/2022 |
||
April 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 15, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
March 15, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.