Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association D B A Elan Financial Services, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Maida, Stephanie Marie, Verhagen, Jason P, against Scott L Will, represented by Vanzyverden, William, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 30, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 03, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 16, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 30, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: January 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: January 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 19, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 19, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 19, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 07, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 07, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 07, 2023ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 07, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 19, 2023ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 19, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: July 19, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: July 20, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
July 19, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Military Affidavit |
||
July 19, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
July 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 19, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 07, 2023 |
ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #1) ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 07, 2023 |
||
July 05, 2023 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
March 07, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 07, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #1) Defendants Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.