Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Paramount Services Llc-Bay Series 4, As Trustee Of The Dollman Trust, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Ackerman, Wystan Michael, against Town Board Of The Town Of Otselic, New York, Town Of Otselic, New York, represented by Coughlin, Keegan James, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
PETITION
Date: September 07, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 07, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 07, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: October 05, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -OPPOSITION TO REQUEST
Date: October 05, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 14, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 12, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 12, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 14, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 05, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 02, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Entered by County Clerk |
||
December 02, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Stipulation and Order and Judgment |
||
December 02, 2022 | Notice of Entry of November 28, 2002 Order and Judgment | ||
November 14, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #1) Stipulation and Proposed Order and Judgment on Verified Petition |
||
November 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 20, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Appearance notice |
||
October 11, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT (Motion #1) Amended Notice of Petition |
||
October 05, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST | ||
October 05, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -OPPOSITION TO REQUEST | ||
October 05, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.