Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Verhagen, Jason P, against Alyssa C Marshall, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 01, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 01, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: November 02, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: November 22, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: November 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2022 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
November 22, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 22, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment |
||
November 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice |
||
November 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215g |
||
November 22, 2022 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
November 22, 2022 | Affidavit of Military Investigation | ||
November 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
November 02, 2022 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) Mailed to Defendant 11/2/2022 |
||
September 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- ALYSSA C MARSHALL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.