Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcdowell And Walker, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Norton, Daniel Robert, against Brenda Price, Robert L Price Jr, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS
Date: March 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 10, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*
Date: May 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: May 26, 2022NOTICE
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: May 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: March 16, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 |
NOTICE Judgment Transfiled to Tioga County |
||
May 26, 2022 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
May 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* Service of Notice of Entry and Judgment |
||
May 24, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected* Notice of Entry, Judgment |
||
May 20, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Amended Affidavit of Daniel Norton Esq. |
||
May 10, 2022 | Affidavit of Attorney Daniel Norton | ||
May 10, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 20, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Brenda Price, AOS |
||
April 20, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Robert Price, AOS |
||
April 07, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of Additional Notice of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.