Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Matthew Crane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Clark, Amanda Marie, against Nicole Crane, represented by Curnalia, Thomas Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 31, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 17, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 11, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 07, 2022 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.