Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Andrew M Sawyer, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 25, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 13, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 13, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: September 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 13, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 13, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: September 30, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 16, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 27, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: October 03, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: October 03, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
October 03, 2022 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
September 30, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
September 27, 2022 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
September 16, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judicial Assignment Notice |
||
September 13, 2022 | Affidavit of Non Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
September 13, 2022 | Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status | ||
September 13, 2022 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
September 13, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing a Copy of the Summons | ||
September 13, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.