Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Kirstie Beers, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: March 14, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 14, 2022 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION Mailed to defendant 3/14/2022 |
||
February 16, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 20, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.