Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Burggraf, Julie R., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mclaughlin, Lawrence Webster, against Cates Ii, Harold C., Juarez, Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with J. Michael Byrne presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Residential Limited (32) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions6 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time6 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination 213510-Hearing: Order of Exam; Burggraf, J. vs. Juarez, K. et al ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration 213310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DECLARATION [213310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Exam: Issued/Filed 227230-Order of Exam Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ORDER OF EXAM FILED [227230] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Exam: Issued/Filed 227220-Order of Exam Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ORDER OF EXAM ISSUED [227220] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney 214810-Substitution of Attorney Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY [214810] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment 226110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT [226110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.