Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Reverse Mortgage Funding Llc, Sunwest Mortgage Company Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Arthur Brent Vannamee, Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc, Betty J Smith, Brian Vannamee, Charlottee Seese, (total of 23) See All in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 16, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 16, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 16, 2021ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 22, 2022ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 22, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 22, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: June 17, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 12, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 22, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: February 02, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: February 02, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: February 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N N/A |
||
February 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P affidavits of publication |
||
February 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O Order Directing Service Pursuant to CPLR 316 |
||
February 02, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion |
||
February 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q Order Appointing Substitute Guardian Ad Litem |
||
February 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T Notice of Appearance |
||
February 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J Service of Process Affidavits |
||
February 02, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Order of Reference and Default Judgment |
||
February 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Department of Defense Search results |
||
February 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.