Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Durward G Daniels Jr, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case represented by Daniels, Cameron Burgin, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Frank Revoir presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Revoir Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Name Change |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Order Granting Leave to Change Name - Entered by County Clerk |
||
July 06, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
May 28, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Order Granting Leave to Change Name |
||
May 28, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Order Granting Leave to Change Name - Entered by County Clerk |
||
May 27, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 18, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Assigned RJI |
||
May 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Hospital certificate |
||
May 17, 2021 |
RJI -RE: 202.6(b) Other, Petition for name change |
||
May 17, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 17, 2021 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.