Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ryan Morgan, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Natoli, Steven Greig, against Laurie Moon, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Partition Of Real Propert) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time114 days |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: January 15, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: November 21, 2019ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: November 21, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 21, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: November 14, 2019MEMORANDUM
Date: October 24, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT NOTICE |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.