Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nbt Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Marks, Paul L, against Erica Fleming, Eric Fleming, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 24, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time99 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 24, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: October 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit for default judgment |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affirmation of mailing-summons and complaint |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* Statement for Judgment-Default |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-Eric Fleming |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.