Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Michael Caporale, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 22, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time101 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 23, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: March 02, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 27, 2020 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
February 07, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
February 07, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
February 07, 2020 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 07, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B CLIENT STATEMENT |
||
February 07, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY AFF |
||
February 07, 2020 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 07, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 07, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.