Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Adriana R Decker, A K A Adriana Decker, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County. This case was filed in Chenango County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS *Corrected*
Date: July 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS *Corrected*
Date: July 22, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS *Corrected* c604174 |
||
July 22, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS *Corrected* c604335 |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DOD MILITARY SEARCH |
||
July 21, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS |
||
July 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
July 21, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON-EXPIRATION OF SOL |
||
April 29, 2022 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) mailed 4/29/2022 |
||
April 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 06, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 09, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.