Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with HON. BRIAN D. BURNS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. BRIAN D. BURNS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2018 |
CategoryForeclosure Conf Ineligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time143 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #003) BURNS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS |
|
September 24, 2018 | Motion |
MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT OF F (Motion #003) Before Justice: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS |
|
September 24, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #003) BURNS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS |
|
September 24, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE POST JUDGEMENT APPLICATION BURNS (Court Activity) Judge: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS |
|
August 17, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) BURNS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS |
|
August 17, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT BURNS (Court Activity) Judge: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS |
|
August 08, 2018 | Motion |
MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF FORECLO (Motion #002) Decided: 08/17/2018GRANTED & SIGNED Before Justice: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS |
|
August 08, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) BURNS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS |
|
July 24, 2018 | Hearing |
BURNS (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS |
|
June 27, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) BURNS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. BRIAN D. BURNS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.