Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mariner Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Gitlin, Robert Brian, against Amy Campanelli, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is filed by Mariner Finance, LLC against Amy Campanelli. Mariner Finance alleges that Amy Campanelli entered into a Note and Security Agreement with Mariner Finance on or about March 16, 2023, for a loan of $4,464.05. According to the ...
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: December 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 23, 2024OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 18, 2023NOTICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 08, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 03, 2024 | Notice of Adjournment 1/26/24 @ 9am | ||
December 18, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Letter confirming Motion for Summary Judgment was mailed to debtor |
||
December 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTION WITH SUPPORTING PAPERS |
||
December 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
December 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION |
||
December 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) PAYOFF STATEMENT & RECORD OF PAYMENTS |
||
December 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SUMMONS,COMPLAINT & AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
December 14, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.