Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Maida, Stephanie Marie, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against David Swartz, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA against David Swartz. The complaint alleges that David Swartz entered into a loan agreement with Goldman Sachs Bank USA and failed to make the required payments, resulting in a defaul...
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: November 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 27, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 12, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 16, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
November 07, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
October 31, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
October 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service- DAVID SWARTZ |
||
September 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A LOAN AGREEMENT |
||
September 27, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.