Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Selip, Mitchell Howard, Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Heather Vanderhoff, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Chemung. The plaintiff, Midland Credit Management, Inc, is suing the defendant, Heather Vanderhoff, in a consumer credit transaction case. The plaintiff alleges that th...
JUDGMENT
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 01, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
December 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
December 01, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT AOF |
||
December 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
December 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
October 24, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
October 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 18, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.