Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Ryan C Mcdonald, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York by Capital One, N.A. against Ryan C McDonald. The complaint alleges that Ryan C McDonald executed an agreement with Capital One, N.A. for a credit or cash advance ...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 06, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: October 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 05, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 05, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 05, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 17, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
October 04, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 04, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 15, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.