Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Visions Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Thomas, William Miles, against Phillip J. Mcdade, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Elizabeth Aherne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Aherne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Visions Federal Credit Union against Phillip J. McDade. The complaint alleges that McDade, the defendant, defaulted on a note executed with the plaintiff. The note has an original principal amount of $2,000...
RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 20, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: October 05, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
November 20, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
||
November 20, 2023 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Judgment and Order |
||
November 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service & mailing |
||
October 20, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of mailing summons & complaint |
||
October 05, 2023 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
October 05, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
October 02, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service summons & complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.