Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Rite Aid Of New York 1093 Group, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Lacap, Henry, against The Assessor And The Board Of Assessment Review Of The Town Of Horseheads, And The Town Of Horseheads, County Of Chemung, New York, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 13, 2023PETITION
Date: July 13, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: July 13, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 13, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: July 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 28, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 24, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) | ||
July 13, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
July 13, 2023 | PETITION | ||
July 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) | ||
July 13, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.