Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Cn Assets, Llc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Jeremy J Gublo, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
JUDGMENT
Date: October 04, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 21, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 14, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 03, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
October 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A INVOICE FOR SERVICE |
||
October 03, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
August 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT additional notice |
||
August 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 14, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 06, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.