Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Robin H Sams, represented by Baggan, Kristi-Ann Kyna, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: December 29, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 21, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
December 29, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 01, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
August 22, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
August 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- ROBIN H SAMS |
||
June 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Cardmember Agreement |
||
June 21, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
June 21, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.