Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mariner Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Gitlin, Robert Brian, against Danielle Vanorden, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING CPLR 308 |
||
September 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATION AFFIRMATION |
||
September 24, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACT | ||
September 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
July 12, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
June 28, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Danielle Vanorden |
||
June 21, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.