Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
New City Funding Corp., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Tammy M. Sparling, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Elizabeth Aherne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 02, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 15, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
||
November 02, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 12, 2023 |
ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1) Order Awarding Attorneys Fees and Authorizing Entry of Default Judgment |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Military status |
||
October 10, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
October 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
October 10, 2023 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
June 30, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
June 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.