Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Ashley Bailey, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 12, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: July 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 25, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR
Date: September 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 25, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: September 26, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 15, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 26, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 25, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
September 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
September 25, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 25, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
September 25, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE | ||
July 03, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
June 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Ashley Bailey |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.