Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Uhg I Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Brett Bennett, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
JUDGMENT
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: January 11, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 11, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OF ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1473894 | ||
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1473894 |
||
January 11, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1473894 | ||
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1473894 |
||
August 01, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
July 24, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 24, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 06, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.