Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Paul B Tillotson, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 24, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 24, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 24, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
June 16, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
June 02, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
June 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS-PAUL B TILLOTSON |
||
April 25, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
April 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Cardmember Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.