Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roth, Gerald C, against John Doe #1 Through And Including John Doe#25, The Defendants Last Named In Quotation Marks Being Intended To Designate Tenants Or Occupants In Possession Of The Herein Described Premises Or Portions Thereof, If Any There Be, Said Names Being Fictitious, Their True Name Being Unknown To Plaintiff, Kelley F. Irwin Troccia, Paul M. Troccia, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Discover Bank against Kelley F. Irwin Troccia, Paul M. Troccia, and several other defendants. Discover Bank alleges that the defendants have failed to comply with the terms of a note and mortgage agreement....
NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 03, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 03, 2023ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: May 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 26, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: May 26, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: August 03, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - b
Date: August 03, 2023FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - a
Date: August 03, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2023CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: August 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
August 03, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - b filed lis pendens |
||
August 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a filed summons |
||
August 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 03, 2023 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
May 31, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER reason for recusal |
||
May 30, 2023 | ORDER - RECUSAL | ||
May 26, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT RJI - Affidavit of Mailing |
||
May 26, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.