Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Mullen, Richard S, against John Doe, Raymond J Dickerson, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Mary Tarantelli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2023ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 01, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 03, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 03, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Note and mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Filed by KAK - 105973 |
||
November 07, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
November 01, 2023 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
October 04, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 02, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) 105973-1 Letter from court re: appearance date/cert of service. azh |
||
September 28, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Motion returnable 11/1 at 9:30 submission only |
||
September 27, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 27, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
September 27, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Supporting Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.